WA SB5443 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the reporting requirements of state and local tax programs.
Title
Concerning the reporting requirements of state and local tax programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-17 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-17 | EDTI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-29 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-22 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5443&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5443.pdf |