WA SB5441 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extending rental vouchers for eligible offenders.
Title
Extending rental vouchers for eligible offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] |
Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-25 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |