WA SB5440 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the legislative-executive WorkFirst poverty reduction oversight task force.
Title
Establishing the legislative-executive WorkFirst poverty reduction oversight task force.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1482 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5440&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5440.pdf |