WA SB5439 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Facilitating the coordinated installation of broadband along state highways.
Title
Facilitating the coordinated installation of broadband along state highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-31 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:00 PM. |
2021-03-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 3. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 330 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 538 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 04 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 04 | 047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 44 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 52 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |