WA SB5439 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning confidentiality of employment security department records and data.
Title
Concerning confidentiality of employment security department records and data.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Chapter 81, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-25 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-01 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1400 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.