WA SB5439 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning oil spills.
Title
Concerning oil spills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-07 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-24 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-03 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-18 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-18 | NRMW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-25 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Marine Waters. |