WA SB5437 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the weighmaster program.
Title
Concerning the weighmaster program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Chapter 158, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2017-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee amendment |
2017-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-21 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | AWTE - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development. |