WA SB5424 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning flexible work for general and limited authority Washington peace officers.
Title
Concerning flexible work for general and limited authority Washington peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor & Commerce (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor & Commerce (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024*. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 319, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2024-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee amendment |
2024-02-27 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-02-19 | House | CSJR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2023-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-03-23 | House | CSJR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor & Commerce. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | LC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1413 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 93 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 26 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |