WA SB5412 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Facilitating supportive relationships with family and significant individuals within the behavioral health system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facilitating supportive relationships with family and significant individuals within the behavioral health system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-15SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-12SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-12SenateBH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-02-03SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-03SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7124New CodeSee Bill Text
7223New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5412&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5412.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5412-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5412%20SBA%20BH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5412%20SBR%20BH%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5412%20SBR%20BH%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124291&actionText=BH%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28594&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback