WA SB5412 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing remedies for whistleblowers in the conveyance work industry.
Title
Providing remedies for whistleblowers in the conveyance work industry.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Effective date 6/7/2012. | |
2012-03-19 | Chapter 54, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-19 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2012-03-05 | Speaker signed. | |
2012-03-01 | President signed. | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2012-02-29 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-02-21 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-02-21 | LWD - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2012-02-21 | LWD - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-02-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-02-15 | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development. | |
2012-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2012-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-13 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2012-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-03 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2012-02-03 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-12 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-07 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. On motion, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-03-07 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-21 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-21 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-21 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-15 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-24 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |