WA SB5405 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Instructing the joint legislative audit and review committee to perform racial equity analyses.
Title
Instructing the joint legislative audit and review committee to perform racial equity analyses.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 310, 2021 Laws PV. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-22 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-22 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
Subjects
AFRICAN AMERICAN AFFAIRS, COMMISSION
ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN AFFAIRS, STATE COMMISSION
HISPANIC AFFAIRS, STATE COMMISSION
LEGISLATIVE AUDIT AND REVIEW COMMITTEE, JOINT (JLARC)
MINORITIES
ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN AFFAIRS, STATE COMMISSION
HISPANIC AFFAIRS, STATE COMMISSION
LEGISLATIVE AUDIT AND REVIEW COMMITTEE, JOINT (JLARC)
MINORITIES
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
44 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 28 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |