WA SB5399 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a universal health care commission.
Title
Concerning the creation of a universal health care commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Health Care & Wellness (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Health Care & Wellness (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 309, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-24 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | New Code | See Bill Text |