WA SB5399 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding school employee workforce reductions and assignments.
Title
Regarding school employee workforce reductions and assignments.
Sponsors
Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-01-24 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5399&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5399.pdf |