WA SB5391 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the disclosure of drug production in improved residential real property sales.
Title
Requiring the disclosure of drug production in improved residential real property sales.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Mona Das [D] |
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | FIET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |