WA SB5387 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning physician credentialing in telemedicine services.
Title
Concerning physician credentialing in telemedicine services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 49, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-20 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:30 AM. |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |