WA SB5381 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting voting requirements for emergency medical service levies.
Title
Adjusting voting requirements for emergency medical service levies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Effective date 6/7/2012. | |
2012-03-29 | Chapter 115, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-29 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2012-03-05 | Speaker signed. | |
2012-03-01 | President signed. | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2012-02-29 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-02-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-02-24 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-02-24 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-02-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-02-16 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2012-02-14 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2012-02-14 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-14 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-01-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2012-01-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-01-25 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2012-01-25 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-01-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-10 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-24 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1476 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.