WA SB5378 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a six-year time frame for substantial building code amendments.
Title
Creating a six-year time frame for substantial building code amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |