WA SB5376 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying indigent defense provisions.
Title
Modifying indigent defense provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-03 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | Senate | No action on notice to reconsider vote on final passage. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Notice given to reconsider vote on final passage. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |