WA SB5362 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring the funding of agricultural fairs.
Title
Ensuring the funding of agricultural fairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 245, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-11 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-22 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |