WA SB5361 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the recommendations of the joint legislative audit and review committee's report analyzing development costs for low-income housing.
Title
Enacting the recommendations of the joint legislative audit and review committee's report analyzing development costs for low-income housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 5:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5361&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5361.pdf |