WA SB5352 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the terminology and duties of the real estate agency relationship law to be consistent with other existing laws.
Title
Clarifying the terminology and duties of the real estate agency relationship law to be consistent with other existing laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 58, 2013 Laws. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2013-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-20 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-20 | House | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-20 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-13 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1487 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - Referred to Business & Financial Services.