WA SB5339 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a business and occupation tax credit for new businesses.
Title
Creating a business and occupation tax credit for new businesses.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Brian Dansel [R] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | TRED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |