WA SB5332 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the percentage of votes required to approve benefit charges for fire protection districts.
Title
Modifying the percentage of votes required to approve benefit charges for fire protection districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 49, 2013 Laws. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2013-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-08 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2013-04-08 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2013-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-29 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2013-03-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-03-26 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-26 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | GOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 6:00 PM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 6:00 PM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1488 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - Referred to Local Government.