WA SB5323 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing pollution from plastic bags by establishing minimum state standards for the use of bags at retail establishments.
Title
Reducing pollution from plastic bags by establishing minimum state standards for the use of bags at retail establishments.
Sponsors
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020*. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 138, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 33; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-03-07 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-04 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-03-02 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2020-02-27 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2020-01-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-04-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-04-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-05 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-04-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2019-03-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-26 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1205 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.