WA SB5276 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Avoiding interest arbitrage charges on bond proceeds in the capital vessel replacement account.
Title
Avoiding interest arbitrage charges on bond proceeds in the capital vessel replacement account.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1103 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-16 - Effective date 2/16/2023.