WA SB5272 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-28 - Effective date 2/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-28 - Effective date 2/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning temporarily waiving certain liquor and cannabis board annual licensing fees.
Title
Concerning temporarily waiving certain liquor and cannabis board annual licensing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-28 | Senate | Effective date 2/28/2021. |
2021-02-28 | Senate | Chapter 6, 2021 Laws. |
2021-02-28 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-02-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-02-23 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-19 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; without recommendation. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
66 | 24 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 244 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 330 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 350 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 420 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 540 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 570 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 580 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 590 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 600 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 650 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 680 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 24 | 690 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |