WA SB5266 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying theft of rental, leased, lease-purchased, or loaned property provisions. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning theft of rental or leased property. )
Title
Modifying theft of rental, leased, lease-purchased, or loaned property provisions. (REVISED FOR PASSED LEGISLATURE: Concerning theft of rental or leased property. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Governor vetoed. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2017-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee amendment |
2017-03-31 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-23 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-03 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1292 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.