WA SB5263 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting devices in schools that are designed to administer to a person or an animal an electric shock, charge, or impulse.
Title
Prohibiting devices in schools that are designed to administer to a person or an animal an electric shock, charge, or impulse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-11 | Chapter 453, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-11 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 1; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-26 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-25 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-25 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2009-04-25 | Rules suspended. | |
2009-04-25 | House receded from amendments. | |
2009-04-24 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. | |
2009-04-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-08 | Held on second reading. | |
2009-04-07 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-27 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-19 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-19 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-19 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-06 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-04 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-24 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-17 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-10 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-10 | JUD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-06 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-27 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1222 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.