WA SB5255 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a lump sum reporting system.
Title
Establishing a lump sum reporting system.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Yasmin Trudeau [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1262 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 23 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 23 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 23 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |