WA SB5251 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring public water system financial assistance activities from the public works board and the department of commerce to the department of health.
Title
Transferring public water system financial assistance activities from the public works board and the department of commerce to the department of health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 111, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-29 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 9:00 AM. |
2016-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM. |
2016-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to General Government & Information Technology |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-07-10 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-07-02 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-06 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2015-04-06 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2015-03-31 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to General Government & Information Technology |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | AWRD - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1464 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.