WA SB5249 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting mastery-based learning.
Title
Supporting mastery-based learning.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Early Learning & K-12 Education (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Early Learning & K-12 Education (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021*. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 144, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-23 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |