WA SB5247 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Updating certain department of early learning advising and contracting mechanisms to reflect federal requirements, legislative mandates, and planned system improvements.
Title
Updating certain department of early learning advising and contracting mechanisms to reflect federal requirements, legislative mandates, and planned system improvements.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Andrew Billig [D] |
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1719 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2017.