WA SB5236 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Mar 30 @ 1:30 pm in House Committee on Appropriations
Hearing: Mar 31 @ 1:30 pm in House Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Mar 30 @ 1:30 pm in House Committee on Appropriations
Hearing: Mar 31 @ 1:30 pm in House Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning hospital staffing standards.
Title
Concerning hospital staffing standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM |
2023-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-03-21 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-03-06 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | LC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
49 | 12 | 480 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 41 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 41 | 420 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 41 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |