WA SB5232 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Environment & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Environment & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing incremental electricity produced as a result of efficiency improvements to hydroelectric generation projects whose energy output is marketed by the Bonneville power administration to qualify as an eligible renewable resource under the energy independence act.
Title
Allowing incremental electricity produced as a result of efficiency improvements to hydroelectric generation projects whose energy output is marketed by the Bonneville power administration to qualify as an eligible renewable resource under the energy independence act.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 6:40 PM. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1360 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.