WA SB5225 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning direct appeals to the court of appeals of cases brought under the administrative procedure act and the land use petition act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning direct appeals to the court of appeals of cases brought under the administrative procedure act and the land use petition act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary
2021-02-23SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-23SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2021-02-12SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-11SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-09SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3405518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3405522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3618018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3670cNew CodeSee Bill Text
3670c090New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5225&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5225.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5225%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5225%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5225%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5225%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123457&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28542&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123457&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-23-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5225&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback