WA SB5214 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Licensing music therapists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing music therapists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-03-10SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2023-02-10SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-02-09SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2023-02-09SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2023-02-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2023-02-07SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2023-01-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB1247 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-25 - Effective date 7/23/2023*.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18New CodeSee Bill Text
18120020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
18130040Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5214&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5214.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5214%20SBA%20HLTC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5214%20SBR%20HLTC%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5214%20SBR%20HLTC%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=65752
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67999
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127592&actionText=HLTC%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30627&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback