WA SB5212 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying parenting plans based on the military service of a parent.
Title
Modifying parenting plans based on the military service of a parent.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] |
Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-06 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-12 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-12 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-10 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-29 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-16 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1170 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-15 - Effective date 7/26/2009.