WA SB5209 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing universal civic duty voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing universal civic duty voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2023-02-08SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-02-07SenateMinority; do not pass.
2023-02-07SenateSGE - Majority; do pass.
2023-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-09SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government & Elections.
2023-01-06SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1220 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-10 - First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29a04New CodeSee Bill Text
29a08New CodeSee Bill Text
29a08320Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
29a08330Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29a08355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29a36161Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
29a40010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29a84New CodeSee Bill Text
4620155Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback