WA SB5198 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sale or lease of manufactured/mobile home communities and the property on which they sit.
Title
Concerning the sale or lease of manufactured/mobile home communities and the property on which they sit.
Sponsors
Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Committee on Housing: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Committee on Housing: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 40, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-03-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-03-23 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-23 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-21 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-16 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Housing. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | HSG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing. |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1129 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - House Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 20 | 030 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 20 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 20 | 073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 20 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 20 | 300 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 20 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 21 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |