WA SB5193 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a nonresident alien to possess weapons when hunting with a Washington-licensed hunter.
Title
Allowing a nonresident alien to possess weapons when hunting with a Washington-licensed hunter.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-05 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-24 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-20 | NROR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-16 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5193&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5193.pdf |