WA SB5188 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the Washington state public bank.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the creation of the Washington state public bank.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-22SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM.
2021-02-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-02-09SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-02-09SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-09SenateBFST - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3958New CodeSee Bill Text
3958050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3959040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4256270Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4256400Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43New CodeSee Bill Text
4310067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43190New CodeSee Bill Text
4384080Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5188&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5188.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5188-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5188-S2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5188%20SBA%20BFST%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5188%20SBR%20BFST%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5188%20SBR%20BFST%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5188%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5188%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5188%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123394&actionText=BFST%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28531&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123394&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28693&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback