WA SB5183 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning victims of nonfatal strangulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning victims of nonfatal strangulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Public Safety (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-05-12SenateChapter 269, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-12SenateGovernor signed.
2021-04-26SenateDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-22SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-19SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-19SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2021-04-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-06HouseCommittee amendment
2021-04-05HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-04-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-04-01HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-04-01HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2021-03-25HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-03-23HousePS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-18HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2021-02-24SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-24SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-24Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-18SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-16SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-16SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-09SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-01-26SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-01-26SenateHSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
768170Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5183&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5183.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5183-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5183-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5183-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5183-S2.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/5183-S2%20AMH%20PS%20H1363.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5183%20SBA%20HSRR%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5183%20SBR%20HSRR%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5183%20SBR%20HSRR%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5183%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5183%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5183%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5183-S2%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5183-S2%20HBA%20PS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5183-S2%20HBR%20PS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5183-S2%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5183-S2%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5183-S2%20SBR%20HA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5183-S2%20SBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123384&actionText=HSRR%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28398&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123384&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28628&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123384&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-24-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5183&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123384&actionText=PS%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28933&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123384&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29%20by%20Public%20Safety.&mId=28974&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123384&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-06-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5183&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123384&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-19-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5183&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback