WA SB5182 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning advisory votes.
Title
Concerning advisory votes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | SGE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29a | 32 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 64 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 72 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 72 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 72 | 283 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 72 | 285 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 72 | 290 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 135 | 041 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |