WA SB5177 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring long-term care workers to be trained to recognize hearing loss.
Title
Requiring long-term care workers to be trained to recognize hearing loss.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Chapter 216, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2017-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee amendment |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-15 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |