WA SB5174 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the recycling of wind turbine blades.
Title
Providing for the recycling of wind turbine blades.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment, Energy & Technology (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70a | New Code | See Bill Text |