WA SB5172 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the retroactivity of overtime claims in exceptional cases.
Title
Concerning the retroactivity of overtime claims in exceptional cases.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Sen. Ron Muzzall [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 249, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 42; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-04-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-26 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:30 AM. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1217 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.