WA SB5170 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restricting the conversion of agricultural land to other uses under the growth management act and shoreline management act.
Title
Restricting the conversion of agricultural land to other uses under the growth management act and shoreline management act.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1216 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5170&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5170.pdf |