WA SB5151 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-23 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Updating the executive team of the office of the secretary of state by adding a chief of staff position.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating the executive team of the office of the secretary of state by adding a chief of staff position.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-01-20SenateSGE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-01-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-09SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government & Elections.
2023-01-04SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4307020Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5151&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5151.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5151-S.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5151%20SBA%20SGE%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5151%20SBR%20SGE%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5151%20SBR%20SGE%20OC%2023.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127138&actionText=SGE%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30391&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback