WA SB5145 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the membership of the health technology clinical committee.
Title
Concerning the membership of the health technology clinical committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] |
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage notwithstanding Governor's Veto (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate vote on Passage notwithstanding the Governor's Veto (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate vote on Passage notwithstanding the Governor's Veto (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Effective date 6/28/2016. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 1, 2016 Laws 1st Special Session. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2016-03-29 | House | On motion, Governor's veto overridden; yeas, 89; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | On motion, Governor's veto overridden; yeas, 40; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 9. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Governor vetoed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-24 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-15 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-26 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |