WA SB5139 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology.
Pending: Senate Energy, Environment & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology.
Pending: Senate Energy, Environment & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring economic development by authorizing public utility districts to provide retail telecommunications services.
Title
Ensuring economic development by authorizing public utility districts to provide retail telecommunications services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1938 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5139&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5139.pdf |